MD SB101 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Making certain provisions of law authorizing the prelitigation discovery of certain insurance coverage information relating to claims involving vehicle accidents applicable to claims involving any tort involving death or bodily injury; providing that an insurer is required to provide a claimant with documentation of the applicable limits of coverage only in a certain automobile insurance policy, homeowner's insurance policy, or renter's insurance policy; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-43) (Y: 94 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-2) (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (94-43)
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-03-20HouseHearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-03-20HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-11HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-02-14SenateThird Reading Passed (42-2)
2019-02-12SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-12SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-11SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-16SenateHearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-16SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-15SenateHearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-14SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback