MD SB1012 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a physician designated by the State Anatomy Board to complete a certificate of death under certain circumstances; requiring a certain physician to enter certain information in a certain section of a death certificate; and requiring the State Anatomy Board to send to the Secretary of Health a report of the cause of death for entry on a certain death certificate if the State Anatomy Board receives information about the cause of death from certain individuals.
Title
Public Health - Death Certificates - Completion and Cause of Death Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-27 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |