MD SB1016 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education to establish the Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program on or before July 1, 2020, for administration of a voluntary certificate program for ethical special education advocates; specifying qualifications and application procedures for a certificate; requiring the Department to issue a certificate to a certain applicant; authorizing an applicant to petition for judicial review of a decision of the Department that relates to issuing or renewing a certificate; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-05SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-27SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback