MD SB1018 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB436
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the regulations adopted by the State Board of Education to govern the licensing and operation of child care centers to include provisions that establish certain qualifications for child care teachers and require each child care center employee to complete certain training within 90 days after the individual is hired; and requiring the State Department of Education to review an individual's qualifications for employment in a child care center within 14 days after receiving a complete application.
Title
Child Care Centers - Employee Qualifications - Requirements and Application Review
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
SB1018 (Carry Over) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1386 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1386 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Child Care
Children
Disabilities
Education
Education, State Department of
Health
Job Training
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Teachers
Time
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Children
Disabilities
Education
Education, State Department of
Health
Job Training
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Teachers
Time
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 5 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 414.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1018?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1018f.pdf |