MD SB102 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 526
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 526
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which the Maryland Department of Health has the authority to change the name on a birth certificate without a court order to allow the Department, if only one parent is named on the birth certificate of the child, to change the name on receipt of certain documents from the parent named on the birth certificate; and providing that only one affidavit signed by both parents named on the birth certificate is required under certain circumstances.
Title
Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Change of Name of Child
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 526 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-2) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Health, Department of
Identification
Minors
Names
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Records
Signatures
Vital Records
Identification
Minors
Names
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Records
Signatures
Vital Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 4 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |