MD SB102 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB788
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a licensed physician, physician assistant, or nurse practitioner work at least three rotations, with each rotation consisting of 100 hours of community-based clinical training in an area identified as having a health care workforce shortage, in order to qualify for a certain credit against the State income tax; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to issue a tax credit certificate for $1,000 for each student rotation for which certain persons served as preceptors without compensation; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {265061/1 Adopted |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {389532/1 Adopted |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2020-10-26 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB788 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
HB1252 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
HB1252 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Forms
Health, Department of
Income Tax
Licenses
Notices
Nurse Practitioners
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Teachers
Time
Fees
Forms
Health, Department of
Income Tax
Licenses
Notices
Nurse Practitioners
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Teachers
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Health Occupations | 15 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 15 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 751 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |