MD SB1026 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definitions of "junkyard" and "scrap metal processing facility" as those definitions apply to the regulation of those facilities near certain highways in the State; authorizing only scrap metal processing facilities and junkyards, as defined in the Act, to purchase scrap metal by weight across an on-site scale; providing that certain provisions of law governing scrap metal processing facilities and junkyards preempt and supersede any conflicting local law; increasing certain penalties; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Regulation - Junkyards and Scrap Metal Processing Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2019-03-14SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback