MD SB103 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering prohibited actions relating to electronic harassment of minors; prohibiting a person from maliciously engaging in an electronic communication if the electronic communication, as part of a series of communications, has the effect of intimidating or harassing a minor and causing physical injury or serious emotional distress to a minor and the person engaging in the electronic communication acts with a certain intent; prohibiting a person from violating the Act with the intent to induce a minor to commit suicide; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 26
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
2019-04-03HouseSpecial Order until 04/04 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {952710/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-03-20HouseHearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-03-20HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-11HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-02-07SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {508171/2 Report Adopted
2019-02-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-15SenateHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-14SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0103&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0103f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0103t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0103e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_26_sb0103e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0103_50817102.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0103_95271001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/sb0103.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0103_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0142.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0103_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1230.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1243.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/ag_letters/sb0103.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback