MD SB1035 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a medical laboratory from using or selling to another person certain data for use in a research study unless a certain individual provides consent to the medical laboratory; repealing a prohibition on certain advertising or solicitation of business for a medical laboratory; and authorizing a certain person to advertise or solicit business in the State for a medical laboratory under certain circumstances: etc.
Title
Medical Laboratories - Use or Sale of Data for Research Study and Advertising or Solicitation of Business
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Advertising
Commerce and Business
Communications
Consumer Protection
Data
Disclosure
Examinations
Federal Government
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Laboratories
Medical Research
Notices
Patients
Privacy
Privileged Communications
Public Health
Records
Solicitation
Commerce and Business
Communications
Consumer Protection
Data
Disclosure
Examinations
Federal Government
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Laboratories
Medical Research
Notices
Patients
Privacy
Privileged Communications
Public Health
Records
Solicitation