MD SB1038 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to extend the deadline for the Board of Trustees of the Sandy Spring Museum, Inc. to present evidence that a matching fund will be provided for the planning, repair, and capital equipping of the Sandy Spring Museum, located in Sandy Spring; requiring the Board of Public Works to expend or encumber the proceeds of the loan by June 1, 2013; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Montgomery County - Sandy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-05 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2012-02-23 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB1038.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb1038f.pdf |