MD SB1038 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of medical cannabis grower licenses that may be authorized by the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission from 15 to 17; requiring the Commission to grant specified approval to specified applicants.
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |