MD SB1038 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court as a condition of sentencing to prohibit a defendant convicted of certain crimes relating to cruelty against animals from owning, possessing, or residing with an animal for a specified period of time.
Title
Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Sentencing Conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {168977/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Abuse
Animals
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Animals
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences