MD SB1038 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Secretary of Transportation to determine that a vehicle or combination of vehicles transporting certain freight is an indivisible load authorized to obtain a certain overweight vehicle permit under certain circumstances; establishing certain conditions for a vehicle issued a permit under the Act, including a requirement to travel only on roads designated as being part of a "heavy weight port corridor"; establishing a certain maximum gross vehicle weight for a vehicle with a certain permit; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2019-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {540913/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {868779/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Fees
Highways
Licenses
Maps and Charts
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Rules and Regulations
State Highway Administration
Time
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures
Highways
Licenses
Maps and Charts
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Rules and Regulations
State Highway Administration
Time
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures