MD SB1044 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Motor Vehicle Repair and Career Certification Program for Ex-Offenders in the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning to provide apprenticeships to ex-offenders in motor vehicle repair and service; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to administer the Program and provide grants on a competitive basis to employers who are located in Baltimore City or Baltimore County, donate motor vehicles serviced under the Program to low-income families, and employ certain ex-offenders; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Motor Vehicle Repair and Career Certification Program for Ex-Offenders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-03-04SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback