MD SB1049 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (96-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (96-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Office of Asbestos Case Mediation and Resolution in the Executive Department; requiring certain civil suits involving asbestos claims to be referred to the Office for mediation; providing for the priority of certain civil suits in the mediation process; requiring all parties referred to the Office to participate in mediation subject to a certain condition; requiring the Director of the Office to notify the court if certain parties are unable to reach agreement through mediation; etc.
Title
Civil Actions - Office of Asbestos Case Mediation and Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (112-21) (Y: 112 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-36) (Y: 96 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-36) (Y: 96 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (96-36) |
2019-04-08 | House | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (112-21) |
2019-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {252612/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2019-04-03 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {228179/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {228179/1 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Courts
Diseases
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Mediation
Notices
Public Officials
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Trials
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Courts
Diseases
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Mediation
Notices
Public Officials
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Trials