MD SB1050 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering penalties applicable to failing to report a lost or stolen regulated firearm.
Title
Public Safety - Lost or Stolen Regulated Firearm - Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {238878/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-21 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB591 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Guns
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Repeat Offenders
Reports
Theft
Disclosure
Guns
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Repeat Offenders
Reports
Theft
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 5 | 146 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |