MD SB1067 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB70
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, the State Department of Education, the Department of Housing and Community Development, and the Department of General Services, to adopt certain regulations on or before June 1, 2022, establishing uniform standards for mold assessment and remediation; requiring the Department of the Environment to submit a certain annual indoor air quality report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1 beginning in 2023; etc.
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
SB1067 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1540 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1540 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Apartments
Assisted Living
Child Care
Civil Actions
Counties
Damages
Disclosure
Diseases
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Eviction
Fees
General Services, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health, Department of
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Injury
Inspections
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Notices
Nursing Homes
Penalties and Sentences
Private Schools
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Information
Public Schools
Real Property
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Water
Assisted Living
Child Care
Civil Actions
Counties
Damages
Disclosure
Diseases
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Eviction
Fees
General Services, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health, Department of
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Injury
Inspections
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Notices
Nursing Homes
Penalties and Sentences
Private Schools
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Information
Public Schools
Real Property
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 5 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 6 | 1601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 6 | 1602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 211.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1067?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1067f.pdf |