MD SB1081 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amending certain prior authorizations of State Debt to alter the requirement that certain grantees provide certain matching funds; extending the deadline for certain grantees to present certain evidence that a matching fund will be presented; extending the termination date of certain grants; changing the locations of certain capital projects; altering the purposes of certain grants; changing the names of certain grantees; altering the authorized uses of certain grants; etc.
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {739132/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Peters) Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Peters) Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Allegany County
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Community Facilities and Services
Elderly Persons
Ethnic Affairs
Fire Protection
Food
Forests and Parks
Garrett County
Heating and Cooling
Highways
Howard County
Libraries
Montgomery County
Monuments and Memorials
Municipal Corporations
Museums
Natural Resources, Department of
Parking
Prince George's County
Prior Authorizations
Program Open Space
Public Schools
Sports and Recreation
State Bonds
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Talbot County
Veterans
Volunteers
Washington County
Work, Labor and Employment
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Community Facilities and Services
Elderly Persons
Ethnic Affairs
Fire Protection
Food
Forests and Parks
Garrett County
Heating and Cooling
Highways
Howard County
Libraries
Montgomery County
Monuments and Memorials
Municipal Corporations
Museums
Natural Resources, Department of
Parking
Prince George's County
Prior Authorizations
Program Open Space
Public Schools
Sports and Recreation
State Bonds
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Talbot County
Veterans
Volunteers
Washington County
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2013 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2014 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |