MD SB112 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing certain reporting requirements that are obsolete, unnecessary, or duplicative; consolidating certain reporting requirements for efficiency; codifying certain reporting requirements for transparency; modifying certain reporting requirements for practicality; repealing the requirement that the Council for the Procurement of Health, Education, and Social Services establish a certain workgroup; repealing the Maryland Advisory Council for Virtual Learning; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
2019-03-11SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-05HouseFavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-02-26HouseHearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-02-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-02-25SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-02-21SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-21SenateFavorable with Amendments {843326/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
2019-02-11SenateHearing 2/13 at 11:00 a.m.
2019-01-16SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects

Accidents
Agents and Brokers
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Aircraft
Annotated Code of Maryland
Apprentices
Aquaculture
Archives
Armed Forces
Attorney General
Attorneys
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Budgets
Certifications
Child Care
Civil Actions
Claims
Codes
Commerce and Business
Commission on Civil Rights
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Colleges
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Cybersecurity
Data
Death
Disabilities
Disclosure
Discrimination
Diseases
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Elderly Persons
Elections
Electronic Communication
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Estates and Trusts
Ethnic Affairs
Examinations
Farmland
Fertilizers
Fire Protection
Funerals
Gender
General Assembly
Gifts
Grants
Harassment
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Highways
Historical Matters
Hospitals
Housing
Human Rights
Human Services, Department of
Industry and Technology
Insurance
Insurance Administration
internet
Job Training
Judgments
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Landscape Architects
Law Enforcement
Legislation
Liability
Libraries
Licenses
Long-Term Care
Maryland Register
Medical Assistance
Minorities
Minors
Morticians
Motion Pictures
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources
Notices
Nursing Homes
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Places of Worship
Plumbing
Pollution
Privacy
Procurement
Public Information
Public Schools
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Religion
Reports
Residency
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
School Administration
School Testing
Sexual Orientation
Small Business
Social Services
Spouses
State Aid
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - General Assembly
State Police, Department of
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Tax Credits
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Threats
Tobacco
Tourism
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Unemployment
Utilities
Volunteers
Voting
Water
Welfare
Work, Labor and Employment

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback