MD SB113 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the manner in which an applicant for a handgun permit is required to pay a certain fee to allow payment by electronic check, credit card, or a method of online payment approved by the Secretary of State Police.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-3) (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {993922/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted (33-13) (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {293228/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted (31-15) (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
2019-04-03HouseSpecial Order until 04/04 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {562018/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseSpecial Order until end of this calendar (Delegate Cardin) Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {562018/1
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-03-13HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-02-28SenateThird Reading Passed (44-3)
2019-02-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26SenateFloor Amendment {993922/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted (33-13)
2019-02-26SenateMotion Returned Second Reading (Senator Smith) Adopted
2019-02-25SenateSpecial Order until 2/26 (Senator Smith) Adopted
2019-02-21SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-21SenateFloor Amendment {293228/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted (31-15)
2019-02-21SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-20SenateSpecial Order until 2/21 (Senator McCray) Adopted
2019-02-20SenateFavorable
2019-02-15SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0113&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0113f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0113t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0113e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_44_sb0113e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0113_29322801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0113_99392201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0113_56201801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/sb0113.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0113_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0244.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0293.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0325.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0113_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1315.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1244.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback