MD SB114 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a person to apply for preliminary approval of a handgun permit to wear, carry, or transport a handgun without completing a certified firearms training course; requiring the Secretary of State Police to investigate an application for a handgun permit; requiring the Secretary to issue preliminary approval if the applicant meets certain requirements except the certified firearms training course; requiring an applicant to satisfy the firearms training requirement within 120 days after receipt of preliminary approval; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback