MD SB115 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 529
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 529
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the reference to a certain report that certain entities are required to file each year with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation from a report on personal property to an annual report; altering the reference to a certain report the Department may require certain entities to file to the report on personal property; etc.
Title
Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 529 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Business Trusts
Corporations
Foreign Ownership
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Personal Property
Property Tax
Reports
Taxes - Property
Business Trusts
Corporations
Foreign Ownership
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Personal Property
Property Tax
Reports
Taxes - Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |