MD SB116 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-11 - Recommit to Committee Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-11 - Recommit to Committee Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a provision of law to establish that only a marriage between two individuals who are not otherwise prohibited from marrying is valid in the State; making specified changes in provisions of law prohibiting marriages within specified degrees of relationship; prohibiting an official of a religious institution or body authorized to solemnize marriages from being required to solemnize any marriage in violation of the constitutional right to free exercise of religion; etc.
Title
Civil Marriage Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Brian Frosh [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] |
Sen. Lisa Gladden [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - House - Floor Amendment (Braveboy) Rejected (Y: 63 N: 72 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - Floor Amendment (Serafini) {873228/1 Rejected (Y: 52 N: 85 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - Floor Amendment (Afzali) {483026/1 Rejected (Y: 53 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - Floor Amendment (Donoghue) {543121/1 Rejected (Y: 58 N: 79 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Motion limit debate (Garagiola) Adopted (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {723626/1 Rejected (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Muse) {723121/1 Rejected (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Muse) {193828/1 Adopted (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {623025/1 Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Peters) {903120/1 Rejected (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - Floor Amendment (Serafini) {873228/1 Rejected (Y: 52 N: 85 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - Floor Amendment (Afzali) {483026/1 Rejected (Y: 53 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - Floor Amendment (Donoghue) {543121/1 Rejected (Y: 58 N: 79 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Motion limit debate (Garagiola) Adopted (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {723626/1 Rejected (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Muse) {723121/1 Rejected (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Muse) {193828/1 Adopted (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {623025/1 Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Peters) {903120/1 Rejected (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Recommit to Committee Judiciary (Delegate Vallario) | |
2011-03-11 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Glenn) Rejected | |
2011-03-11 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Olszewski) Rejected | |
2011-03-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-09 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Braveboy) Rejected (63-72) | |
2011-03-09 | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted | |
2011-03-09 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Braveboy) | |
2011-03-09 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Serafini) Rejected (52-85) | |
2011-03-09 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (53-87) | |
2011-03-09 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Donoghue) Rejected (58-79) | |
2011-03-08 | Laid Over (Delegate Donoghue) Adopted | |
2011-03-08 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Donoghue) | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-25 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-25 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2011-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (25-21) | |
2011-02-24 | Motion limit debate (Senator Garagiola) Adopted (30-17) | |
2011-02-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (25-22) | |
2011-02-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-31) | |
2011-02-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) Rejected (19-28) | |
2011-02-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) Adopted (26-21) | |
2011-02-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (15-30) | |
2011-02-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) Withdrawn | |
2011-02-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) Rejected | |
2011-02-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Withdrawn | |
2011-02-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) Withdrawn | |
2011-02-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Peters) Rejected (17-30) | |
2011-02-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-02-22 | Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted | |
2011-02-22 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-02-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-21 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |