MD SB116 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-30 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-30 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified sellers to provide buyers of specified motor vehicles with a statement regarding the right of the buyer to cancel the sale and a description of how the buyer may return the motor vehicle; requiring specified sellers to provide buyers with a fully completed receipt or copy of a contract that pertains to a specified Internet sale and contains specified information; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet Sales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 2:30 p.m. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Generally
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Electronic Commerce
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Unfair Trade Practices
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Generally
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Electronic Commerce
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Unfair Trade Practices