MD SB116 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the definition of "complete streets design features" under the Complete Streets Program by adding access to retail stores that provide health food and other necessities, especially in food deserts, as a design feature of the complete street policy and as a design feature and goal of the Program; and providing the Act may not be construed to require the Maryland Department of Transportation to provide staff or operating expenses for the administration of the Program until money is appropriated in the State budget.
Title
Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-11) (Y: 122 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-11) |
2019-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {197378/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Bicycles
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Community Development
Construction
Data
Food
Governor
Grants
Health
Highways
Mass Transit
Pedestrians
Records
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Sidewalks
State Highway Administration
Transient Merchants
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Zoning and Planning
Appropriations
Bicycles
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Community Development
Construction
Data
Food
Governor
Grants
Health
Highways
Mass Transit
Pedestrians
Records
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Sidewalks
State Highway Administration
Transient Merchants
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Zoning and Planning