MD SB12 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, to the extent practicable and subject to certain waiver provisions, that the State include public art in capital projects that are funded entirely with state funds, or are funded with a combination of at least 50% of State funds and the remainder from funds from private entities, and are not funded in the annual State capital budget; providing it is the intent of the General Assembly that the requirements of the Act will not increase the cost of a construction project or a major renovation project; etc.
Title
Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-6) (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-6) (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-6) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {114069/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {747373/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Budget and Management, Department of
Capital Budget
Capital Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Economic and Community Development
General Services, Department of
Prices
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Procurement
Tourism
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Budget and Management, Department of
Capital Budget
Capital Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Economic and Community Development
General Services, Department of
Prices
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Procurement
Tourism