MD SB120 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a requirement for designating a beneficiary of a member, former member, or retiree of the State Retirement and Pension System; providing an option for a member, former member, or retiree to designate a beneficiary through the State Retirement Agency's secure access participant portal with an electronic signature; altering the definition of "designated beneficiary"; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Designation of Beneficiary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 9:00 a.m. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Cybersecurity
Death
Electronic Communication
internet
Minors
Notices
Privacy
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Signatures
Spouses
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Cybersecurity
Death
Electronic Communication
internet
Minors
Notices
Privacy
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Signatures
Spouses
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Telecommunications and Information Technology