MD SB122 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property used for the purposes of a public school robotics program or nonprofit robotics program in the State; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to provide, by law, for certain matters relating to the tax credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.
Title
Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Counties
Industry and Technology
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Property Tax
Public Schools
Real Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Industry and Technology
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Property Tax
Public Schools
Real Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Telecommunications and Information Technology