MD SB123 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the State Administrator of Elections or the State Administrator's designee to investigate a potential violation of certain provisions of law prohibiting certain coordinated expenditures and donations; authorizing the State Administrator or designee to issue a subpoena for the attendance of a witness to testify or the production of records; requiring the State Administrator, in order for a subpoena to be issued, to make a finding that the subpoena is necessary to and in furtherance of a certain investigation; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Coordinated Expenditures and Donations - Investigation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-27) (Y: 112 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (112-27)
2019-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseSpecial Order until 04/06 (Delegate Walker) Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-02-20SenateThird Reading Passed (43-3)
2019-02-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-18SenateFloor Amendment {153225/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2019-02-18SenateFloor Amendment {623323/1 (Senator Cassilly) Withdrawn
2019-02-15SenateSpecial Order until 2/18 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2019-02-15SenateFloor Amendment {623323/1 (Senator Cassilly)
2019-02-14SenateLaid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2019-02-14SenateFloor Amendment {623323/1 (Senator Cassilly)
2019-02-14SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-13SenateSpecial Order until 2/14 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2019-02-13SenateFavorable
2019-02-13SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-23SenateHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0123&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0123f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0123t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_712_sb0123t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0123_62332301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0123_15322501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/sb0123.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0123_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0236.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0123_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1500.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback