MD SB124 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the applicability of a certain assessment by the State to certain entities for certain products that were subject to § 9010 of the Affordable Care Act, as in effect on December 1,2019; and requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2020, on certain information related to establishing State-based individual market health insurance subsidies in Maryland.
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and State–Based Individual Market Health Insurance Subsidies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 104 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-6) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-33) |
2020-03-15 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (133-1) |
2020-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {906389/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-2) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {547179/1 Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {547179/1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB196 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 105
Subjects
Assessments
Commerce and Business
Communications
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Federal Government
Fees
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
internet
Liability
Medical Assistance
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
Commerce and Business
Communications
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Federal Government
Fees
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
internet
Liability
Medical Assistance
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Aid