MD SB125 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 63
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 63
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an insurer from canceling, refusing to renew, or otherwise terminating coverage for a private passenger motor vehicle insurance policy based on claims made under the policy's towing or emergency roadside coverage; authorizing an insurer to remove towing or emergency roadside service coverage from a certain policy at renewal based on the number of claims pursuant to the towing coverage; and authorizing an insurer to increase a premium of a private passenger motor vehicle insurance policy as a result of certain claims.
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Prohibition on Cancellation Due to Towing or Emergency Roadside Coverage Claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 63 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB118 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 62
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Claims
Emergencies
Fees
Highways
Insurance - Other than Health
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Towing
Claims
Emergencies
Fees
Highways
Insurance - Other than Health
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Towing