MD SB127 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law requiring a county superintendent of schools to allow a child awaiting foster care placement not subject to certain educational stability provisions of the federal McKinney-Vento Homeless Assistance Act to attend school in the county even if the child is not currently domiciled in that county; and updating certain provisions of law to include references to the educational stability provisions of the Every Student Succeeds Act.
Title
Education - Public School Attendance - Homeless Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Boundaries
Counties
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Human Services, Department of
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Prices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Social Services
Students
Youth
Counties
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Human Services, Department of
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Prices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Social Services
Students
Youth