MD SB129 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB296
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from using contributor information from any report or statement required under provisions of law governing campaign finance for commercial solicitation purposes; and prohibiting a person from publishing contributor information from any report or statement required under provisions of law governing campaign finance in newspapers, magazines, books, or other similar media for the purpose of facilitating commercial solicitation.
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB129 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 13 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |