MD SB133 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing funds in the Bay Restoration Fund, in fiscal 2016 and thereafter, to be used to pay up to 87.5% of the total cost of projects relating to combined sewer overflows abatement, rehabilitation of existing sewers, and upgrading specified conveyance systems; specifying that an order of priority for specified projects funded by the Bay Restoration Fund in specified fiscal years shall be determined by the Department of the Environment; and generally relating to the use of funds in the Bay Restoration Fund
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153 |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Delegates Frush, Lafferty, and Anderton |
2015-04-10 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-10 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-1) |
2015-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {840613/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {244136/1 Report Adopted |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Conservation
Counties
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Grants
Municipal Corporations
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Conservation
Counties
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Grants
Municipal Corporations
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage