MD SB133 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the termination date for certain provisions of law applicable to the registration and authorized use of farm area motor vehicles, including a provision increasing from 10 miles to 25 miles the radius from a farm within which a person may operate on a highway a motor vehicle registered as a farm area motor vehicle; and requiring the owner of a farm area motor vehicle to submit a certain application and documentation for registration of the vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 173
2019-04-02SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-02-07SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-22SenateHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback