MD SB133 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1494
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to 2.25% the minimum rate a county shall impose on an individual's Maryland taxable income; requiring a county that imposes the county income tax on an income basis to set, by ordinance or resolution, certain income brackets; altering the calculation of a certain grant to certain counties under certain circumstances; prohibiting a county that imposes the county income tax on an income tax bracket basis from setting a minimum income tax rate less than 2.25%; etc.
Title
Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Floor Amendment 793422/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 91 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Floor Amendment 723426/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Floor Amendment 793422/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 91 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Floor Amendment 723426/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-40) |
2021-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment {793422/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (43-91) |
2021-04-07 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Chisholm) Adopted |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-24 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Floor Amendment {723426/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (17-29) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted (32-14) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {279239/1 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB319 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
HB1494 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
HB1494 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 16 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |