MD SB134 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to provide a revised printed statement of an individual's State criminal history record to the State Board of Nursing if the criminal history record information is reported to the Central Repository after the date of the initial criminal history records check; etc.
Title
State Board of Nursing – Criminal History Records Checks – Revised Statement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {814733/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Archives
Certifications
Criminal Background Investigations
Drugs
Federal Government
Fingerprinting
Health Occupations
Medication Technicians
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Archives
Certifications
Criminal Background Investigations
Drugs
Federal Government
Fingerprinting
Health Occupations
Medication Technicians
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports