MD SB137 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transferring the functions, powers, and duties of the Child Support Unit of the Office of the State's Attorney for Harford County to the Child Support Administration of the Department of Human Services; providing for the determination of salary grade and seniority for transferred employees; requiring certain employer contributions and interest on behalf of certain transferred employees be transferred within the accumulation fund for the Employees' Pension System from the municipal pool to the State pool; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 197
2020-03-17SenatePassed Enrolled
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {834168/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-03-16HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-14HouseHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-14HouseReferred Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-02-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {707472/1 Adopted
2020-02-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-01-15SenateHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-13SenateReassigned to Finance
2020-01-10SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB407 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 196

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law10117(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback