MD SB14 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the number and altering the qualifications of the incorporators required to form a commercial bank or a savings bank in the State; repealing certain provisions relating to additional and vacant directorships of certain commercial banks; etc.
Title
Financial Institutions - State Banks, Trust Companies, and Savings Banks - Incorporators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498 |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-1) |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (128-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Financial Institutions | 3 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 3 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 3 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 3 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 3 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 3 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 3 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 4 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 4 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |