MD SB141 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Updating and correcting obsolete references to certain educational institution accrediting bodies in the Maryland Public Accountancy Act.
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy – Education Requirements – Obsolete References
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Occupations and Professions | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |