MD SB143 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the date, to on or before December 31, 2020, by which the Department of Natural Resources is required to prepare a certain fishery management plan for the cownose ray species, subject to available funding; continuing the prohibition on a person sponsoring, conducting, or participating in a certain cownose ray fishing contest in State waters until the Department prepares a certain fishery management plan for the cownose ray species.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-7) (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-02SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (127-7)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-19HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-27HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-02-26SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-02-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {964532/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-23SenateHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback