MD SB144 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing, for purposes of filing a petition for U Nonimmigrant Status, a victim of qualifying criminal activity or the victim's parent, guardian, or next friend to request a certifying official to certify victim helpfulness on a Form I-918, Supplement B certification under certain circumstances; providing the certifying entity must certify or decline certification of the form within 90 days of receiving a certain request; providing that a certifying entity or official is immune from certain criminal or civil liability; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-23) (Y: 109 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (109-23)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {478078/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-23SenateHearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback