MD SB144 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending, from January 1, 2020, to January 1, 2023, the taxable years for which individuals or corporations may claim a State income tax credit for the expense of registering certain qualified vehicles in the State.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Extension
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB221 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Tax - General | 10 | 734.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |