MD SB146 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring commercial driver's license training schools to include training on the recognition, prevention, and effective reporting of human trafficking as part of the curriculum; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to include content on the recognition, prevention, and effective reporting of human trafficking in its Commercial Driver's License Manual; and requiring the Administration to provide to an applicant renewing a commercial driver's license certain information from the Manual.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {580513/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-12HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-07SenateFloor Amendment {753222/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-02-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2019-02-05SenateSpecial Order until 2/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-02-05SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-02-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {278079/1
2019-02-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-22SenateHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0146&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0146f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0146t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0146e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_233_sb0146e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0146_27807901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0146_75322202.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0146_58051301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0146.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0146_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0177.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0146_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1045.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1245.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback