MD SB147 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from purchasing for, distributing, or selling kratom to an individual under the age of 18 years of age, except under certain circumstances; providing it is a defense in a prosecution under the Act that the defendant examined the purchaser's driver's license or other valid identification that positively identified the purchaser or recipient as at least 18 years of age; establishing that a violation of the Act is a civil penalty; providing for the issuance and prosecution of a civil citation issued under the Act; etc.
Title
Criminal Law – Kratom – Prohibited Purchase, Distribution, or Sale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-11) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {618874/1 Adopted |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {618874/1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 3:00 p.m. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB283 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Citations
Civil Actions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Health
Identification
Law Enforcement
Minors
Notices
Repeat Offenders
Trials
Civil Actions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Health
Identification
Law Enforcement
Minors
Notices
Repeat Offenders
Trials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 5 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |