MD SB148 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the carbon dioxide emissions rate for certain affected electric generating units from exceeding 180 pounds per million British thermal units; establishing the Fossil Fuel Community Transition Fund to provide grants to certain individuals and communities; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to establish certain policies and procedures for the administration of the Fund; requiring the Maryland Energy Administration to use the Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund to provide certain funding; etc.
Title
Electric Generation – Transition From Fossil Fuels – Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-31 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB66 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Air Pollution
Allegany County
Anne Arundel County
Apprentices
Budgets
Charles County
Committees and Commissions
Energy
Energy Matters
Engineers
Environment
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Fuel
Grants
Higher Education
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Managers and Supervisors
meetings
Montgomery County
Pollution
Prince George's County
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Trucks
Unemployment
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Allegany County
Anne Arundel County
Apprentices
Budgets
Charles County
Committees and Commissions
Energy
Energy Matters
Engineers
Environment
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Fuel
Grants
Higher Education
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Managers and Supervisors
meetings
Montgomery County
Pollution
Prince George's County
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Trucks
Unemployment
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 2-10A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2-10A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2-10A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 20B-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 20B-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |