MD SB15 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of State Police to provide a certain notice of the impending expiration of a certain handgun permit and certain renewal instructions to a holder of a certain handgun permit at least 60 days before the expiration of the permit by electronic mail, if the holder of the permit has provided an e-mail address to the Secretary, or by mail.
Title
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Notice of Expiration and Renewal Instructions
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {278078/1 Adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-10-09 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Guns
internet
Licenses
Notices
Postal Service
Public Safety
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Electronic Government
Guns
internet
Licenses
Notices
Postal Service
Public Safety
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 5 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |