MD SB155 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain provision of law requiring a financial aid administrator to verify certain information under certain circumstances; altering the method by which a financial administrator at a public institution of higher education is required to verify that a certain youth is a homeless youth; providing that a certain youth who receives a tuition exemption is entitled to priority consideration for on-campus housing; requiring a certain public institution to designate a certain homeless and foster student liaison; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {284637/1 Adopted |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB216 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Subjects
Age
Appeals
Community Facilities and Services
Counselors
Data
Federal Aid
Federal Government
Forms
Foster Care
Gender
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
internet
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Poverty
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
School Administration
Sexual Orientation
Social Workers
State Aid
Students
Time
Tuition
Youth
Appeals
Community Facilities and Services
Counselors
Data
Federal Aid
Federal Government
Forms
Foster Care
Gender
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
internet
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Poverty
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
School Administration
Sexual Orientation
Social Workers
State Aid
Students
Time
Tuition
Youth