MD SB160 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Adding bladder cancer and kidney or renal cell cancer to the types of cancer that are considered occupational diseases suffered in the line of duty and are compensable in a certain manner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-21SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments {787978/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback