MD SB162 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Classifying a certain offense of human trafficking as a crime of violence under certain provisions of law.
Title
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {388979/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |